Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company v. Riverside Navigation, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company
Defendant: Active Shipping & Management Pte Ltd., Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd., Afra Riverside, LLC, Active Denizcilik Ve Gemi Isletmeciligi A.S., Riverside Navigation, Ltd. and Mehmet Ali Umur
Not Classified By Court: Blue Marine Security, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00614
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 32 Post-Hearing MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Vacate the Rule B Attachment MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint addressing admiralty jurisdiction in accordance with minute entry granting leave filed by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd.. (Patrick, Patrick) Modified on 11/13/2020 (NLT).
November 12, 2020 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Vacate by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Association, #2 Exhibit bank records, #3 Exhibit email, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Mehmet Ali Umur, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Ulrich H. Stahl)(LaVie, Kevin) Modified on 11/13/2020 (NLT).
November 4, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2020 re #18 MOTION to Vacate the Rule B Attachment MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint filed by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd. Counsel presents oral argument to the Court. Matter is taken under advisement. As instructed by the Court, Counsel may file post hearing briefs, if desired, no later than 11/12/2020. Briefs limited to 8 pages in length. (Court Reporter N. Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
November 4, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Marc C. Matthews by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company (LaVie, Kevin)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Expedited Hearing. A hearing is set for Wednesday, November 4, 2020, at 2:00 P.M. via ZoomGov video conferencing. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/30/2020. (ELW)
October 30, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of #18 MOTION to Vacate the Rule B Attachment MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint filed by Riverside Navigation, Ltd.. (ELW)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/30/2020. (ELW)
October 29, 2020 Filing 25 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Vacate Order of Attachments and Dismiss the Verified Complaints by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order Granting Leave to File)(Patrick, Patrick) Modified on 10/29/2020 to edit text (ELW).
October 27, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #18 MOTION to Vacate the Rule B Attachment MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint, #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Patrick, Patrick)
October 26, 2020 Filing 23 Letter dated 10/26/2020 from James Power to Judge Brian Jackson re: Expedited Hearing. (Patrick, Patrick) Modified on 10/27/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of #18 MOTION to Vacate the Rule B Attachment MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint and Amended Verified Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Patrick, Patrick) Modified on 10/26/2020 to edit text (ELW).
October 14, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Vacate the Rule B Attachment MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint filed by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(LaVie, Kevin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 First Amended Verified Complaint, Prayer for Process and Relief by maritime Attachment against Active Denizcilik Ve Gemi Isletmeciligi A.S., Active Shipping & Management Pte Ltd., Afra Riverside, LLC, Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd., Riverside Navigation, Ltd., Mehmet Ali Umur, filed by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(LaVie, Kevin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/15/2020) (ELW). Modified on 10/15/2020 to correct page orientation (ELW). Modified on 10/16/2020 to edit text (ELW).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for James Power to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Vacate the Rule B Attachment and to Dismiss the Verified Complaint by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Patrick, Patrick) Modified on 10/5/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 10/5/2020 (SWE).
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 Affidavit of James Power by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd. re #15 MOTION for James Power to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2181154) (Patrick, Patrick) Modified on 10/5/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Restricted Appearance by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd. (Patrick, Patrick)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for James Power to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2181154) by Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Patrick, Patrick)
October 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION for James Power to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2181154). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Ex Parte Unopposed Motion for Authorization to Supply Bunkers to The M/V Riverside. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/30/2020. (LLH)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Substitute the Proposed Pleadings for Previously Filed Doc. 11 filed by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/29/2020. (ELW)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute the Proposed Pleadings for Previously Filed Doc. 11 by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Pleading;)(LaVie, Kevin) Modified on 9/28/2020 to edit text (LLH).
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 Ex Parte Unopposed MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum in Support of Motion for Authorization to Supply Bunkers to the M/V Riverside by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Order)(LaVie, Kevin) Modified on 9/28/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/30/2020) (ELW). (Attachments 1-3 replaced on 9/30/2020) (ELW). Modified on 9/30/2020 as ordered (ELW).
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed. Served on M/T RIVERSIDE on 09/16/2020. (US Marshal, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Permit Vessel Movement. The USM for the Middle District of Louisiana shall permit cargo operations, repairs, and movement of the MIT RIVERSIDE (IMO. 9412464) (the "Vessel") within the Middle District of Louisiana while under attachment in this District. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/16/2020. (LLH)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Appointment of Substitute Custodian. Blue Marine Security, LLC appointed. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/16/2020. (EDC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 WRIT of of Foreign Attachment issued as to M/T RIVERSIDE (IMO. 9412464). (EDC)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Writ of Attachment Pursuant to Admiralty Rule B. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/16/2020. (EDC)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Declaration)(LaVie, Kevin) Modified on 9/16/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proof of insurance, #2 Order, #3 Declaration)(LaVie, Kevin) Modified on 9/16/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment Pursuant to Rule B by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Writ of Foreign Attachment)(LaVie, Kevin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Permit Vessel Movement by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Order)(LaVie, Kevin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT, Prayer for Process and Relief by Maritime Attachment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2171807.), filed by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rule B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(LaVie, Kevin) Modified on 9/16/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/16/2020 to correct page orientation) (SWE).
September 15, 2020 Notice of Payment of $250.00 Bond by Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company. Filing fee $ 250, receipt number ALAMDC-2171888. (LaVie, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company v. Riverside Navigation, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Active Shipping & Management Pte Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick Hannon Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glory Riverside Navigation Ltd.
Represented By: James Power
Represented By: Stephen E. Mattesky
Represented By: Patrick Hannon Patrick
Represented By: Francis A. Courtenay, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afra Riverside, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Hannon Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Active Denizcilik Ve Gemi Isletmeciligi A.S.
Represented By: Patrick Hannon Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Navigation, Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick Hannon Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehmet Ali Umur
Represented By: Patrick Hannon Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nassau Maritime Holdings Designated Activity Company
Represented By: Kevin Jacob LaVie
Represented By: Magdalini Galitou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Blue Marine Security, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?