Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mixon
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Todd W. Mixon
Case Number: 3:2020cv00650
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Considering the #6 Notice of Related Proceedings filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, the clerk shall administratively terminate this action in his record, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/28/2020. (SWE)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Securities and Exchange Commission (Schiff, Andrew)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/14/2020. (KAH)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. All Defendants. (Rhorer, Davis)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Todd W. Mixon. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance for Attorneys representing United States by Securities and Exchange Commission (Rhorer, Davis)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Todd W. Mixon, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Todd Mixon)(Rhorer, Davis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd W. Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Davis Rhorer
Represented By: Andrew O. Schiff
Represented By: Alexander H. Charap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?