Turner v. Ascendium Education Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Tyler J. Turner
Defendant: Ascendium Education Group, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., Louisiana Office of Student Financial Assistance and Ascendium
Case Number: 3:2020cv00660
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Ascendium Education Group. (Lutkewitte, Conor)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Travis)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #4 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Lutkewitte, Conor)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ascendium Education Group. (Lutkewitte, Conor)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ascendium Education Group, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Lutkewitte, Conor)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Ascendium Education Group, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Lutkewitte, Conor)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/7/2020. (BLR)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/7/2020. (BLR)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC - Ascension Parish, Case Number 129140-C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2181085), filed by Ascendium Education Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Pleading; Notice pursuant to 28 USC Sect. 1447(b), #8 Proposed Pleading; Consent to Removal of Case to Federal Court)(Lutkewitte, Conor) (Main Document 1 and attachment 1 replaced on 10/2/2020) (EDC). Modified on 10/2/2020 for page orientation. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Ascendium Education Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendium Education Group
Represented By: Thomas J. Lutkewitte
Represented By: Conor Thomas Lutkewitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Lutkewitte
Represented By: Conor Thomas Lutkewitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Office of Student Financial Assistance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendium
Represented By: Thomas J. Lutkewitte
Represented By: Conor Thomas Lutkewitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler J. Turner
Represented By: Keyojuan Gant Turner
Represented By: Travis J. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?