Roberts v. 3M Health Information Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glenn William Roberts
Defendant: 3M Health Information Systems, Inc. and 3M Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00663
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/14/2020. (KAH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by 3M Company, 3M Health Information Systems, Inc..(Halverson, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute Unsigned Civil Cover Sheet filed by 3M Company, 3M Health Information Systems, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/6/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Unsigned Civil Cover Sheet by 3M Company, 3M Health Information Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Signed Civil Cover Sheet)(Halverson, Andrew)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-699198. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2181302), filed by 3M Health Information Systems, Inc., 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Halverson, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/5/2020) (EDC). Modified on 10/5/2020 to rotate pages. (EDC). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/6/2020 in accordance with RD 3) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. 3M Health Information Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn William Roberts
Represented By: Kenneth D. St. Pe'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Health Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew John Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?