Argonaut Insurance Company v. Falcon V, L.L. C.
Not Classified By Court: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Appellee: Falcon V, L.L. C.
Appellant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00702
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION/Request for Certification of Direct Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit filed by Falcon V, L.L. C.. (Phillips, Louis)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties will comply with the following briefing schedule as stated herein. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/14/2020. (EDC)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Appellate Briefs and for an Order to Adopt Proposed Briefing Schedule by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Farley, Matt) Modified on 12/8/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION/Request for Certification of Direct Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Farley, Matt) Modified on 11/30/2020 to edit text (LLH).
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation of Record on Appeal, #2 Appellee Designation of Record on Appeal, #3 cover letter from US Bankruptcy Court)(EDC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment, #12 Attachment, #13 Attachment, #14 Attachment, #15 Attachment, #16 Attachment, #17 Attachment, #18 Attachment, #19 Attachment, #20 Attachment) (EDC).
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-10547. File received, filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Letter)(LLH)
October 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argonaut Insurance Company v. Falcon V, L.L. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Falcon V, L.L. C.
Represented By: Louis Middleton Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Matt J. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?