Fontenot v. W&T Offshore, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tanner Fontenot
Defendant: W&T Offshore, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Brandon P. Vasser
Case Number: 3:2020cv00704
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Gregory J. Miller for Tanner Fontenot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 15, 2020 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #16 Motion to Dismiss filed, the show cause set for December 17, 2020 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 15, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Enroll Gregory Miller as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Tanner Fontenot. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Miller, Gregory)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Enroll Gregory Miller as Attorney by Tanner Fontenot. (Miller, Gregory)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Tanner Fontenot is ordered to appear through counsel and show cause on December 17, 2020 at 12:30 p.m. via Zoom video conference before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's #7 October 22, 2020 Order, ordering Plaintiff to file either a Notice regarding the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332 or a Motion to Remand. Participant instructions are attached. In lieu of appearing for the show cause hearing, Plaintiff shall comply with the Order and submit the required filings by no later than December 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/3/2020. (BLR)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by W&T Offshore, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(LLH)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: GRANTING the #11 Motion for Leave to File Comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal and Memorandum and Supporting Evidence filed by Defendant W&T Offshore, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute the Comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal at R. Doc. 11-2 and exhibits attached thereto at R. Doc. 11-3 through 11-10 in the place of the original Notice of Removal at R. Doc. 1 and exhibits attached thereto at R. Doc. 1-2 through R. Doc. 1-5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 12, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to File Comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal and Memorandum and Supporting Evidence. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal and Memorandum and Supporting Evidence by W&T Offshore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Amended Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit A-4, #7 Memorandum in Support, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit 2)(Brignac, Len) Modified on 11/12/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses by W&T Offshore, Inc..(Brignac, Len) Modified on 11/9/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
November 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying the #8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal and Memorandum and Supporting Evidence by Defendant W&T Offshore, Inc. While the Memorandum in Support of the Amended Notice of Removal adequately addresses the Courts #7 October 22, 2020 briefing Order and presents evidence supporting the jurisdictional threshold for removal, the proposed Amended Notice of Removal fails to adequately identify the domicile of the Plaintiff, Tanner Fontenot. Allegations of residency are insufficient. See the Courts #7 briefing order. Defendant shall re-file any amended pleadings to meet the requirements of the Court's #7 briefing order by no later than November 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal and Memorandum and Supporting Evidence by W&T Offshore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Memorandum in Support, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Brignac, Len) Modified on 11/2/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
November 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal and Memorandum and Supporting Evidence . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 11/2/2020, Defendant W&T Offshore Inc. shall file a motion for leave to file a comprehensive amended Notice of Removal and a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met. On or before 11/12/2020, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff agrees that Defendant has established, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the amount in controversy likely exceeds $75,000.00; or (2) a Motion to Remand. Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020. Motions shall be filed by 11/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/22/2020. (EDC)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/22/2020. (BLR)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Certificate of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1441 and 1446 by W&T Offshore, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Brignac, Len)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certificate of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by W&T Offshore, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Brignac, Len)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by W&T Offshore, Inc.. (Brignac, Len)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Brandon P. Vasser who is lead counsel for party Tanner Fontenot. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-699734. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2188779), filed by W&T Offshore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4)(Brignac, Len)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontenot v. W&T Offshore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W&T Offshore, Inc.
Represented By: George B. Jurgens, III
Represented By: Len R. Brignac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanner Fontenot
Represented By: Gregory J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Brandon P. Vasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?