Edwards v. America's Home Place, Inc
Not Classified By Court: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Appellee: America's Home Place, Inc.
Appellant: Catherine S. Edwards
Case Number: 3:2020cv00808
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Bankruptcy Hearing before Judge Douglas D. Dodd held on 10/5/2020. Court Reporter: Janice Russell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2021. (LLH)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Designation of Record by United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(LLH)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Barry W. Miller as Attorney. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/22/2020. (SWE)
December 18, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #4 MOTION for Barry W. Miller and The Steffes Firm, LLC to Withdraw as Attorney (with Certificate of Service). This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (BLR)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Barry W. Miller and The Steffes Firm, LLC to Withdraw as Attorney (with Certificate of Service) by Catherine S. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Miller, Barry)
December 16, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Barry W. Miller and The Steffes Firm, LLC to Withdraw as Attorney (with Certificate of Service). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Within Which Appellant Must File the Designation of Record, Statement of Issues to Be Presented on Appeal and Transmission of Designation. Designation of Record and Statement of Issues are due 1/8/2021. Transmission of Designation is due 1/27/2021. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/10/2020. (KMW)
December 10, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Within Which Appellant Must File the Designation of Record, Statement of Issues to Be Presented on Appeal and Transmission of Designation (with Certificate of Service). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Within Which Appellant Must File the Designation of Record, Statement of Issues to Be Presented on Appeal and Transmission of Designation (with Certificate of Service) by Catherine S. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Miller, Barry)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-10822. File received, filed by Catherine S. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Judgment, #2 Appeal Transmittal Letter)(KMW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2020: #3 Attachment Notice Regarding Appeals to the District Court) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. America's Home Place, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: America's Home Place, Inc.
Represented By: E. Scott Hackenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Catherine S. Edwards
Represented By: Barry W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?