Fleming v. Vannoy et al
Petitioner: Jarvis Fleming
Respondent: Darrel Vannoy and Jeff Landry
Case Number: 3:2020cv00834
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 Return on FedEx Confirmation as to #4 Habeas Corpus Order (SWE)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: In order for this Court to determine the action, if any, that shall be taken on this application,the District Attorney for the Parish of East Baton Rouge shall file an answer & memo of authorities, along w/copies of all briefs & memoranda. Along with the response, The District Attorney for the 19th Judicial District Court shall file an electronic certified copy of the state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts as well as a certified electronic copy of all documents. The Clerk of Court for the 19th Judicial District Court shall file, in a conventional manner, not electronic, a courtesy copy of the entire state court record filed by the state. The Clerk of this Court serve, by any means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of the entire application & this order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, and the Clerk of Court for 19th Judicial District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Shipment Confirmations)(SWE)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Petitioner may proceed without prepayment of costs or fees and without the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/14/2021. (SWE) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/19/2021 to remove blank page) (SWE).
December 11, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Jarvis Fleming. (KMW)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jarvis Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Affidavit)(KMW)
December 10, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jarvis Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?