Creel v. City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge
Plaintiff: Siya Creel
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge d/b/a Baton Rouge Police Department, City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge doing business as Baton Rouge Police Department and Murphy Paul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00880
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: The scheduling conference set for 3/4/2021 at 02:30 PM has been CONVERTED to a telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
February 18, 2021 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by Siya Creel. (Craft, Jill)
February 2, 2021 Filing 21 Reply Brief to #18 Memorandum in Opposition to #11 Supplemental MOTION for Injunctive Relief, filed by Siya Creel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(EDC)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by Siya Creel. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/2/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
February 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Reply Memorandum in Support of #11 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Siya Creel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit termination letter 1-29-21, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Reply, #3 Proposed Order for Leave, #4 Proposed Reply Memorandum, #5 Proposed Exhibit to Proposed Reply Memorandum, Exhibit 1, in globo, #6 Proposed Exhibit to Proposed Reply Memorandum, Exhibit 2, in globo)(Craft, Jill) Modified on 2/2/2021 to add docket entry relationship and edit text (SWE).
January 25, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #11 Supplemental MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge, Murphy Paul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Raines, James)
January 25, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge, Murphy Paul.(Raines, James)
January 20, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Irreparable Harm (Attachments to #11 Supplemental MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Siya Creel) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification)(SWE) Modified on 1/21/2021 to edit docket text (SWE).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 MOTION to File Attachments to #11 Supplemental MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Siya Creel. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
January 12, 2021 Filing 14 Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint against City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge, filed by Siya Creel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verification)(KMW)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The #10 Motion to File Supplemental, Amending and Restated Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Siya Creel, is GRANTED. There is no scheduling order currently in place and Plaintiff has shown good cause in support of the motion as the amendment relates to alleged events and claims that have arisen since the filing of his original Petition. Further, the amendment cases no prejudice to Defendant because it has not yet appeared, and the Motion was filed approximately twenty-four days after service of the original Petition (on two of the three agents upon which Plaintiff requested service), and fourteen days after the matter was removed to this Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket the [10-2] Supplemental, Amended, and Restated Complaint and [10-3] Verification attached thereto, into the record of this matter, which shall become the operative Amended Complaint and Verification of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to File Attachments to #11 Supplemental MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Siya Creel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Irreparable Harm by plaintiff, #2 Affidavit Verification to Supplemental Motion for Injunctive Relief, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Craft, Jill) Modified on 1/12/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE).
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 Supplemental MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Siya Creel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Supplemental Memorandum)(Craft, Jill) Modified on 1/12/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to File Supplement, Amending and Restated Complaint by Siya Creel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint, #3 Attachment Verification)(Craft, Jill) Modified on 1/11/2021 to edit text (ELW). Modified on 1/12/2021 (NLT).
January 11, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Amend Supplement, and Restate Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
January 6, 2021 *** Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to set Preliminary Injunction for hearing. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. (NLT)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2021. Deadlines set as contained in the attached. (BKA)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/6/2021. (KMW)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a). The City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge answer due 1/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/5/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: A review of this matter shows that the defendant has not paid the filing fee associated with the #1 Notice of Removal. The defendant shall remit the filing fee of $402.00 by no later than 1/6/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 5, 2021 Notice of Payment of $402.00 Initial Filing Fee by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ALAMDC-2228955. (Gremillion, Druit)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Dial-in instructions will be forwarded via email from the Courtroom Deputy. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BKA)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to set Preliminary Injunction for hearing and proposed order by Siya Creel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Craft, Jill) Modified on 1/5/2021 to edit text (ELW)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Gremillion, Druit) Modified on 12/31/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
December 31, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Jill L. Craft regarding Kaitlin A. Wall who is Co-Counsel for party Siya Creel. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC - East Baton Rouge, Case Number C702363. (), filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge d/b/a Baton Rouge Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Raines, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creel v. City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siya Creel
Represented By: Jill L Craft
Represented By: William Brett Conrad, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge d/b/a Baton Rouge Police Department
Represented By: James R. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge doing business as Baton Rouge Police Department
Represented By: James R. Raines
Represented By: Leo Charles Hamilton
Represented By: Druit George Gremillion, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Paul
Represented By: James R. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?