Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1546 et al v. Capital Area Transit System
Plaintiff: Yvette Rhines, Anthony Holmes, Shavez Smith, Toye Hebert, George DeCuir and Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1546
Defendant: Capital Area Transit System
Case Number: 3:2020cv00888
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1546, George DeCuir, Toye Hebert, Anthony Holmes, Yvette Rhines, Shavez Smith. (Richard-Spencer, Julie)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Arbitration by Capital Area Transit System. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Foster, Murphy). Added MOTION to Stay on 2/24/2021 (KMW). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 2/24/2021 (KMW).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte/Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings with Request for Expedited Consideration. Defendant Capital Area Transit System is granted an extension of 21 days, or until 2/23/2021, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/2/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Ex Parte Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, With Request for Expedited Consideration by Capital Area Transit System. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Foster, Murphy). Modified on 2/1/2021 to edit event and text (LLH).
February 1, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint MOTION for Expedited Hearing. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 3/11/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at 225-389-3602. Status Report due by 2/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/19/2021. (SGO)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Holmes, Toye Hebert, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1546, George DeCuir, Yvette Rhines, Shavez Smith. Capital Area Transit System served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Richard-Spencer, Julie)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital Area Transit System. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Area Transit System ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2227428.), filed by Anthony Holmes, Toye Hebert, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1546, George DeCuir, Yvette Rhines, Shavez Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit)(Richard-Spencer, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1546 et al v. Capital Area Transit System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Rhines
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Holmes
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavez Smith
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toye Hebert
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George DeCuir
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1546
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Area Transit System
Represented By: Alexandra Cobb Hains
Represented By: Murphy James Foster, III
Represented By: David Clayton Fleshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?