Smith v. City of Gonzales
Plaintiff: Spenser G. Smith and Spenser Glenn Smith
Defendant: City of Gonzales
Case Number: 3:2021cv00031
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULING and ORDER : The #2 and #6 Motions to Proceed in forma pauperis are DENIED. Plaintiff is required to pay the filing fee of $402.00 by no later than March 26, 2021. The #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 03/5/2021. (ELW) Modified on 3/5/2021to edit text (ELW).
February 3, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION to Appoint Counsel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Spenser G. Smith. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(KMW)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Gonzales, filed by Spenser G. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(KMW)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro-Se E-Notice & E-Notice Consent Form by Spenser G. Smith (KMW)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Complaint for Employment Discrimination) (KMW)
January 12, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Spenser G. Smith. (KMW)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Gonzales, filed by Spenser G. Smith.(KMW)
January 8, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Pro Se (non-inmate) Flag (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City of Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spenser G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spenser Glenn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?