Jordan et al v. Gautreaux et al
Plaintiff: Sahara Claiborne, Shaheedra Jordan and Leiaja Claiborne
Defendant: John Doe #5, CorrectHealth, East Baton Rouge Parish, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, John Doe # 2, Nurse Brumfield, ABC Insurance Company, Jacob Page, Jermaine Cruz, Jean Llovet, John Doe # 3, John Doe # 4, Damien King, Warden Dennis Grimes, Justin Minor, Michael Britt, Carlo Musso, John Doe #6, Captain Leader, Joe Coleman, Rodney Johnson, Nurse Chapman, Kenyaki Domino, John Doe #1, Lieutenant Grant, Nurse Foy, Dennis Grimes, Unknown Brumfield, Unknown Chapman, Unknown Foy, Unknown Grant, Correct Health and Unknown Unknown
Case Number: 3:2021cv00048
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion to Continue Status Report Deadline and Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 5/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 18, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Status Report Deadline and Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Status Report Deadline and Scheduling Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Murell, Christopher)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sahara Claiborne, Shaheedra Jordan, Leiaja Claiborne. East Baton Rouge Parish waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Murell, Christopher)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sahara Claiborne, Shaheedra Jordan, Leiaja Claiborne. Michael Britt waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Joe Coleman waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Jermaine Cruz waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Kenyaki Domino waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Sid J. Gautreaux, III waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Unknown Grant waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Dennis Grimes waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Rodney Johnson waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Damien King waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Justin Minor waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Jacob Page waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Unknown Unknown waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 waiver of service, #2 waiver of service, #3 waiver of service, #4 waiver of service, #5 waiver of service, #6 waiver of service, #7 waiver of service, #8 waiver of service, #9 waiver of service, #10 waiver of service, #11 waiver of service)(Haley, Ronald)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 3/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/27/2021. (KAH)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAMDC-2235834.), filed by Sahara Claiborne, Shaheedra Jordan, Leiaja Claiborne. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Haley, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan et al v. Gautreaux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CorrectHealth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Llovet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dennis Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlo Musso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenyaki Domino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Foy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Foy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahara Claiborne
Represented By: Ronald S. Haley, Jr.
Represented By: Lewis Unglesby, Sr
Represented By: Adrian Michael Simm, Jr
Represented By: Dedrick Arvell Moore
Represented By: Christopher James Murell
Represented By: Lance Covington Unglesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaheedra Jordan
Represented By: Ronald S. Haley, Jr.
Represented By: Lewis Unglesby, Sr
Represented By: Adrian Michael Simm, Jr
Represented By: Dedrick Arvell Moore
Represented By: Christopher James Murell
Represented By: Lance Covington Unglesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leiaja Claiborne
Represented By: Ronald S. Haley, Jr.
Represented By: Lewis Unglesby, Sr
Represented By: Adrian Michael Simm, Jr
Represented By: Dedrick Arvell Moore
Represented By: Christopher James Murell
Represented By: Lance Covington Unglesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?