Aertker v. Dresser LLC et al
Plaintiff: SAM R AERTKER and Sam R. Aertker
Defendant: Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC, General Electric Company, Dresser RE LLC, Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality and Baker Hughes
Case Number: 3:2021cv00055
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/16/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2261091) by Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Stakelum, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2261091). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 5, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss #16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Bryant, Mitchell) Modified on 3/8/2021 (LLH).
March 4, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Exhibit Ex 5)(Smith, Meghan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/4/2021 to edit the docket text) (SWE).
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Tiffany Dupree for General Electric Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/4/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Tiffany Dupree as Additional Attorney by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Meghan)
March 4, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Tiffany Dupree as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 4/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/1/2021. (KAH)
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC, General Electric Company, Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, filed by Sam R. Aertker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bartlett, Harvey) Modified on 2/22/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2021 to correct page orientation) (KMW).
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Certification of State Court Record by Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stakelum, Andrew)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The #12 Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Defendants Dresser, LLC; Dresser RE, LLC; Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC; and Baker Hughes Inc. (collectively, "Defendants") is GRANTED. Defendants now have until February 23, 2021, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/4/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendant General Electric Company's #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings is GRANTED. General Electric Company now has until February 23, 2021, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/4/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
February 4, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
February 4, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bryant, Mitchell)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Meghan)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings for All Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/3/2021. (SWE)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Smith, Meghan)
February 1, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings for All Defendants. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings for All Defendants by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Meghan)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions for Tracie J. Renfroe and Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/28/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
January 28, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Tracie J. Renfroe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2240798), #6 MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2240804). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2240804) by Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Stakelum, Andrew)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Tracie J. Renfroe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2240798) by Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Stakelum, Andrew)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC identifying Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Holdings L L C for Dresser LLC; Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Company, Corporate Parent GE Oil & Gas US Holdings I, Inc., Corporate Parent EHHC NewCO LLC for Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc.; Corporate Parent Dresser, LLC for Dresser RE LLC.. (Stakelum, Andrew)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The #2 Motion to Substitute Pleading filed by Defendants Dresser, LLC; Dresser RE, LLC; Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC; and Baker Hughes Inc. is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court will substitute the revised Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 2-1) in place of the current Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
January 25, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal (Dkt. #1) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal (Dkt. #1) by Baker Hughes, Baker Hughes, Inc., Dresser LLC, Dresser RE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Corrected Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stakelum, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-702370. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2237402), filed by Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC, Dresser RE LLC, Dresser LLC, Baker Hughes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stakelum, Andrew) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/25/2021 in accordance with record document 3) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aertker v. Dresser LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Stakelum
Represented By: Craig A. Stanfield
Represented By: Mitchell B. Bryant
Represented By: Robert J. Burvant
Represented By: Eric Earl Jarrell
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Michael Cerniglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Stakelum
Represented By: Craig A. Stanfield
Represented By: Mitchell B. Bryant
Represented By: Robert J. Burvant
Represented By: Eric Earl Jarrell
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Michael Cerniglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Marjorie A. McKeithen
Represented By: Meghan Smith
Represented By: Tiffany Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser RE LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Stakelum
Represented By: Craig A. Stanfield
Represented By: Mitchell B. Bryant
Represented By: Robert J. Burvant
Represented By: Eric Earl Jarrell
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Michael Cerniglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes
Represented By: Craig A. Stanfield
Represented By: Mitchell B. Bryant
Represented By: Robert J. Burvant
Represented By: Eric Earl Jarrell
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Michael Cerniglia
Represented By: Andrew M. Stakelum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM R AERTKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam R. Aertker
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?