Jones v. East Baton Rouge Parish Prison
Plaintiff: Paul Conrad Jones
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Prison
Case Number: 3:2021cv00063
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration of #3 Ruling, MOTION to Reopen Case by Paul Conrad Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KMW)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 Letter dated 3/8/2021 from Paul Jones to Pro-Se Law Clerk Re: Statement of Account (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (KMW) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/15/2021 to correct page orientation) (KMW).
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: The above captioned proceeding is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure of the Plaintiff to correct the deficiencies of which he wasnotified. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 3/4/2021. (SWE)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 RULING: The above-captioned proceeding is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 3/4/2021. (SWE)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2021. Filing Fee due by 2/24/2021. Statement of Account due by 2/24/2021. (SWE) (Main Document 2 replaced to correct fee on 2/3/2021) (SWE).
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against East Baton Rouge Parish Prison, filed by Paul Conrad Jones.(KMW)
January 25, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. East Baton Rouge Parish Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Conrad Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?