Gordon v. Greene et al
Plaintiff: Paula A. Gordon
Defendant: Leslie Nelson Parker, Karen H. Allain, Hunter V. Greene, Prisca A. Zeigler, Dennis Stephen Fitzgerald and Donald T. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00067
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Prisca A. Zeigler. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Wright, Stacy)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion to Stay Discovery, filed by Defendant Karen H. Allain. Discovery in this matter has already been stayed pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants, Judges Hunter Green and Donald T. Johnson (R. Doc. 10). The stay of discovery will remain in effect until resolution all motions that raise threshold issues of jurisdiction and/or immunity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 03/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(EWD)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Discovery pending resolution of motion to dismiss by Karen H. Allain. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Scott, Joseph)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Karen H. Allain. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - docket sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - voluntary recusal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Ruling of La. 1st Circuit)(Scott, Joseph) Modified on 3/16/2021 to edit the docket text and un-terminate motion (SWE).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery in this matter is STAYED pending a resolution of the #5 Motion to Dismiss. The 6/10/2021 scheduling conference in this matter is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/16/2021. (SWE)
March 16, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Dismiss. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
March 16, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Stay Discovery pending resolution of motion to dismiss. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #4 Waivers of Service Returned Executed, Scheduling Conference is reset for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/27/2021.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Hunter V. Greene, Donald T. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Evans, James)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1), MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Hunter V. Greene, Donald T. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Evans, James)
March 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
March 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paula A. Gordon. Karen H. Allain waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Dennis Stephen Fitzgerald waiver sent on 2/24/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Hunter V. Greene waiver sent on 2/22/2021, answer due 4/23/2021; Leslie Nelson Parker waiver sent on 2/24/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Prisca A. Zeigler waiver sent on 1/23/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (KMW)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 10:30 AM in chambers. Status Report due by 3/18/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/3/2021. (SWE)
February 2, 2021 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Paula Gordon in the amount of $402.00. Transaction posted on 1/29/2021. Receipt number 4699030717 processed by lhiltz. (TDA)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Pro-Se E-Notice & E-Notice Consent Form by Paula A. Gordon (KMW)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen H. Allain, Dennis Stephen Fitzgerald, Hunter V. Greene, Donald T. Johnson, Leslie Nelson Parker, Prisca A. Zeigler, filed by Paula A. Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 civil cover sheet)(KMW)
January 25, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Pro Se (non-inmate) Flag (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Greene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula A. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Nelson Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen H. Allain
Represented By: Joseph K Scott, III
Represented By: Sarah Shannahan Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter V. Greene
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisca A. Zeigler
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Stephen Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Johnson
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?