Imbraguglio v. LeBlanc et al
Plaintiff: Dominic Imbraguglio and Dominick Imbraguglio
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy, Vincent Knight, John Tubbs and James LeBlanc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00113
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appeal from the Disciplinary Board by Dominick Imbraguglio (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Payment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment Letter from EDLA)(KMW)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Dominick Imbraguglio. (KMW)
April 5, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Dominick Imbraguglio. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(KMW)
March 31, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Darrell Vannoy, James LeBlanc, John Tubbs, Vincent Knight, filed by Dominic Imbraguglio. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Statement of Claim, #2 Attachment Cover Letter)(KMW)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2021. Filing Fee due by 4/14/2021. Statement of Account due by 4/14/2021. (KMW)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Exhibits by Dominic Imbraguglio (KMW)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Exhibits, ARP by Dominic Imbraguglio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(KMW)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Exhibits by Dominic Imbraguglio (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(KMW)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Dominic Imbraguglio Re: Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1) (Attachments: #1 local rule 5) (KMW)
February 22, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dominic Imbraguglio. (KMW)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief against Darrell Vannoy, filed by Dominic Imbraguglio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KMW)
February 18, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imbraguglio v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?