Hall v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Hall
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Not Classified By Court: David P. Matthews and Richard Freese
Case Number: 3:2021cv00117
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #26 Joint MOTION for Temporary Stay. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
April 1, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #26 Joint MOTION for Temporary Stay. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (SWE)
March 31, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Temporary Stay filed on behalf Plaintiff and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly) Modified on 4/1/2021 to edit docket text (SWE).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Sylvia E. Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, and Brian G. Reaney, II for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 2, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Sylvia Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2255084) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing NY, #4 Certificate of Good Standing TX, #5 TX Bar Certificate)(Rookard, Kelly)
March 2, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Richard B. North, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
March 2, 2021 Filing 20 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, and Brian G. Reaney II as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
March 2, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, and Brian G. Reaney II as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
March 2, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Sylvia Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2255084). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 2, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #21 MOTION for Richard B. North, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 Motions in Limine Orders (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 Miscellaneous Orders (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 17 Certified Amended Transfer (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 16 MDL Docket Sheet (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 Master and Short Form Pleadings (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 DISCOVERY ORDERS (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 13 DISCOVERY AND PRIVILEGE ORDERS (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION ORDERS (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 DAUBERT ORDERS (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 Case Management Order No. 47 (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 Case Management ORDER (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52)(KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 Letter to Attorney David P. Matthews who is lead counsel for party Joshua Hall. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from the Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01140. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Louisiana via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/24/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/24/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/24/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/24/2021.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20898 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiff(s) are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/24/2021.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1140-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/24/2021.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16553092 filed by Joshua Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: Sylvia E. Simson
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alison Amanda Spindler
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: Sylvia E. Simson
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alison Amanda Spindler
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David P. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard Freese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?