Munguia v. Vargas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lincol Munguia
Defendant: Carlos Vargas and Vargas, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00156
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (ELW)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT : The action be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/07/2021. (ELW)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss/NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lincol Munguia (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Davis, Daniel) Modified on 5/7/2021 to edit text and event type (ELW).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendants Carlos Vargas and Vargas, LLC are granted an extension of time until 4/28/2021 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/7/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by All Defendants. (Abadie, Creighton) Modified on 4/6/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
April 6, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 5/20/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 5/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/22/2021. (SGO)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lincol Munguia. Vargas, LLC served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (Davis, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carlos Vargas, Vargas, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos Vargas, Vargas, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2260754.), filed by Lincol Munguia. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons)(Davis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munguia v. Vargas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Vargas
Represented By: Creighton Brooks Abadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vargas, LLC
Represented By: Creighton Brooks Abadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincol Munguia
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Randall Eugene Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?