Griffin v. Collan
Plaintiff: Deshaun Griffin
Defendant: Whitney Collan
Case Number: 3:2021cv00161
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations filed by Deshaun Griffin. (KMW) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/14/2021 to attach the complete scan) (KMW).
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $60.00 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/20/2021. (SWE)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 Complaint. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that the Court decline the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over any potential state law claims, and that this action be dismissed, with prejudice, as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and 1915A. Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/20/2021. (KMW)
March 18, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Deshaun Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 proposed order 1, #3 Proposed Order 2)(KMW)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Whitney Collan.(KMW)
March 17, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Collan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Collan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshaun Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?