Stoklosa v. Stupp Bros., Inc
Plaintiff: Anna Stoklosa
Defendant: Stupp Bros., Inc d/b/a Stupp Corporation and Stupp Bros., Inc doing business as Stupp Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00162
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Consent Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference and to Reset Deadline to Submit Status Report. Status Report due by 7/22/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 5/11/2021. (SWE)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Consent MOTION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference and to Reset Deadline to Submit Status Report by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Peak, Thomas) Modified on 5/11/2021 to edit text. (EDC). Added MOTION to Continue on 5/11/2021 (EDC).
May 11, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Consent MOTION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference and to Reset Deadline to Submit Status Report MOTION to Continue. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 5/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/24/2021. (KAH)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demanded against Stupp Bros., Inc d/b/a Stupp Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2262627.), filed by Anna Stoklosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Centner, Daniel) Modified on 3/19/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoklosa v. Stupp Bros., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stupp Bros., Inc d/b/a Stupp Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stupp Bros., Inc doing business as Stupp Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Robert Peak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Stoklosa
Represented By: Daniel Centner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?