Adair Holdings. LLC v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Adair Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States of America and United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2021cv00175
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time until 5/21/2021 to File Response to #3 Rule 12(b)(5) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Replies are due by 6/4/2021. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 04/23/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) Modified on 4/23/2021 (KDC).
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #3 Rule 12(b)(5) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Adair Holdings, LLC. (Castille, Melissa) Modified on 4/23/2021 to edit text (LLH).
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #3 Rule 12(b)(5) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 12(b)(5) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph E. Gerstell)(Griffith-Braud, Monica) Modified on 4/2/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Melissa T. Castille regarding Rebecca D. Barham who is Co-Counsel for party Adair Holdings, LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-704990. (), filed by Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record/Exhibit 1, #3 Attachment Federal Tax Lien/Exhibit 2)(Griffith-Braud, Monica) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/26/2021 to correct page orientation) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adair Holdings. LLC v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Monica Griffith-Braud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Monica Griffith-Braud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Monica Griffith-Braud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adair Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Tannehill Castille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?