Ayala v. Patriot Industries, LLC
Plaintiff: Jose Ayala
Defendant: Patriot Industries, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00189
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: Considering the Order (R. Doc. 5) extending the answer deadline for Defendant, the Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2021 is RESET to 8/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. The deadlines to file a Joint Status Report is extended to 7/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendant Patriot Industries, LLC is granted an extension of time until 6/24/2021 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/2/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Patriot Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Bankston, Larry)
June 1, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 6/10/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 5/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/13/2021. (SGO)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Patriot Industries, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patriot Industries, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2270614.), filed by Jose Ayala. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Davis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala v. Patriot Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ayala
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Randall Eugene Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jenna H. Linn
Represented By: Larry S. Bankston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?