Brown v. Argonaut Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Brown
Defendant: Pava Logistics, Inc., Argonaut Insurance Company and Joseph Henry Taliaferro
Case Number: 3:2021cv00218
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Terminate Hearings (SWE)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for 6/17/2021 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2021. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 6/25/2021. Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/29/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 12/3/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 11/12/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/17/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 1/28/2022. Motions shall be filed by 2/25/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 7/22/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/12/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 8/19/2022. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 to 9/1/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/9/2021. (SWE)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Wanda Brown. (Lorio, Amber)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 Joseph Henry Taliaferro & Pava Logistics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pava Logistics, Inc., Joseph Henry Taliaferro.(Pujol, Timothy)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Wanda Brown Pava (Lorio, Amber) Modified on 5/21/2021 to edit text (ELW).
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Wanda Brown Henry Taliaferro (Lorio, Amber) Modified on 5/21/2021 to edit text (ELW).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 6/17/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 6/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/22/2021. (SGO)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 2-2 in place of R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 20, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Removal with corrected heading)(Pujol, Timothy)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JDC, Parish of Livingston, Case Number 167986 DIV. C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2274879), filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Petition, #3 Affidavit Answer to Petition, #4 Attachment Answer obo Prog, #5 Attachment Dismissal of Progressive, #6 Attachment Motion to Compel Ans to Disc)(Pujol, Timothy) Modified on 4/23/2021 to replace removal as per Order #3 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Argonaut Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pava Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Earle Pujol
Represented By: Megan Lindsey LeBlanc
Represented By: Barbara Lane Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Earle Pujol
Represented By: Megan Lindsey LeBlanc
Represented By: Barbara Lane Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Henry Taliaferro
Represented By: Timothy Earle Pujol
Represented By: Megan Lindsey LeBlanc
Represented By: Barbara Lane Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Brown
Represented By: Amber D. Lorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?