Rodgers v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr.
Defendant: Mayor of St. Francisville, Unknown Manchester, Mayor of West Feliciana Parish, Unknown Wright, Unknown Scott, Unknown King, John Bel Edwards, Darrell Vannoy, Mayor of New Roads, Unknown LeBlanc, Unknown Bonnett, Unknown Dornier, Unknown Ramsey, Unknown Smith, Mayor of the City of Angola and Unknown Franklin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00233
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr in the amount of $10.34. Transaction posted on 6/11/2021. Receipt number 4699030997 processed by eclement. (IJE)
June 8, 2021 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr in the amount of $10.34. Transaction posted on 6/7/2021. Receipt number 4699030982 processed by kwilcox. (IJE)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Withdraw Funds is DENIED. Plaintiff shall pay the initial partial filing fee as ordered in R. Doc. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/19/2021. (KAH)
May 11, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Funds by Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr. (KMW)
May 5, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Withdraw Funds. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr. (KMW)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Summons)(KMW)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.34 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. The Clerk of Court is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. No service shall be made by the United States Marshal's Service at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/28/2021. (EDC)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr. Re: Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1). (Attachments: #1 local rule 5) (EDC)
April 22, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ., ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr.. (EDC)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Bonnett, Unknown Dornier, John Bel Edwards, Unknown King, Unknown LeBlanc, Unknown Manchester, Mayor of New Roads, Mayor of St. Francisville, Mayor of West Feliciana Parish, Mayor of the City of Angola, Unknown Ramsey, Unknown Scott, Unknown Smith, Darrell Vannoy, Unknown Wright, filed by Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 summons, #3 envelope)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor of St. Francisville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor of West Feliciana Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bel Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor of New Roads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dornier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor of the City of Angola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Daniel Rodgers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?