Smith v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Smith
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Not Classified By Court: Russell W. Budd
Case Number: 3:2021cv00262
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 23 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #22 Order granting temporary stay, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion for Temporary Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 06/07/2021. (NLT)
May 25, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Temporary Stay filed on behalf of Plaintiffs and by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly) Modified on 5/25/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Dale Rose Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 21, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Dale Rose Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2289814) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing NY, #4 Affidavit)(Rookard, Kelly)
May 21, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Dale Rose Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2289814). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Sylvia E. Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney J. Burton LeBlanc, IV for Brenda Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Sylvia Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2288703) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing NY, #3 Certificate of Good Standing TX, #4 Certificate of Good Standing TX, #5 Affidavit)(Rookard, Kelly)
May 19, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Burton LeBlanc as Attorney of Record for the Plaintiff Brenda Smith. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BLR)
May 19, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Sylvia Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2288703). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRENDA SMITH against Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, filed by Brenda Smith.(LeBlanc, J.)
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Burton LeBlanc as Attorney of Record for the Plaintiff Brenda Smith by Brenda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, J.)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw Counsel of Record. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is hereby withdrawn ascounsel of record for C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/13/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll Counsel of Record. Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, Brian G. Reaney, II, and Connor Peth of the law firm of Irwin Fritchie Urquhart &Moore LLC are hereby enrolled as counsel of record for Defendants, C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/13/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 13, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Richard B. North, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney , #10 MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, Brian G. Reaney II and Connor W. Peth as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Richard B. North, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, Brian G. Reaney II and Connor W. Peth as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/10/2021. (BLR)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE and ORDER: Plaintiff, Brenda Smith shall file an Amended Complaint that contains all of Plaintiffs numbered allegations as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, without reference to any other document in the record, and that adequately alleges the citizenship of Plaintiff Brenda Smith. Brief due by 5/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/10/2021. (ELW)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to Attorney Russell W. Budd who is Pro Hac Vice counsel for party Brenda Smith. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Amended Case Mgt. Order No. 50, Daubert Orders, Master and Short Form Pleadings, Case Management Orders, Deposition Designation Orders, Certified Transfer Order, Case Mgt. Order No. 47, Discovery and Privilege Orders, Misc. Orders, Certified Docket MDL 15-2641, Discovery Orders, and Motions in Limine Orders (Attachments: #1 Daubert Orders, #2 Master and Short Form Pleadings, #3 Case Management Orders, #4 Deposition Designation Orders, #5 Certified Transfer Order, #6 Case Mgt. Order No. 47, #7 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #8 Misc. Orders, #9 Certified Docket MDL 15-2641, #10 Discovery Orders, #11 Motions in Limine Orders)(KMW)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from the Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-01388. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW)
May 6, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Louisiana via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *Amended by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-1388-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
May 5, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14198969 filed by Brenda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Alison Amanda Spindler
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: Connor William Peth
Represented By: Dale Rose Goldstein
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Sylvia E. Simson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Alison Amanda Spindler
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: Connor William Peth
Represented By: Dale Rose Goldstein
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Sylvia E. Simson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Smith
Represented By: Laura J. Baughman
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?