Delta Investments BMO Harris, et al v. Jara Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: Delta Investments BMO Harris and Delta Investments BMO Harris doing business as Delta Investments
Defendant: Jara Enterprises LLC and United States of America, Small Business Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv00264
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States of America, Small Business Administration. (Griffith-Braud, Monica)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference and Status Report Deadline for good cause shown. Status Report is now due by 8/19/2021. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/15/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Status Report Deadline by United States of America, Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Griffith-Braud, Monica)
June 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Status Report Deadline . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond. United States of America, Small Business Administration shall file its answer or response by 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/25/2021. (EDC)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond by United States of America, Small Business Administration. (Griffith-Braud, Monica) Modified on 5/24/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
May 24, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 01:00 PM in chambers. Status Report due by 6/24/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/10/2021. (SWE)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Melissa Tannehill Castille regarding Rebecca D. Barham who is Co-Counsel for party Delta Investments BMO Harris. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-706115. (), filed by United States of America, Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Mortgage, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffith-Braud, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Investments BMO Harris, et al v. Jara Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Investments BMO Harris
Represented By: Melissa Tannehill Castille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Investments BMO Harris doing business as Delta Investments
Represented By: Melissa Tannehill Castille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jara Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Small Business Administration
Represented By: Monica Griffith-Braud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?