Southern Marsh Collection, LLC v. Cocklebur Creek Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Southern Marsh Collection, LLC
Defendant: Cocklebur Creek Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00265
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: Considering the #5 Summons Returned Executed and that defendant has not made an appearance, the Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2021 is RESET for 8/26/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southern Marsh Collection, LLC. Cocklebur Creek Company, LLC served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Davis, Alan)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 7/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2021. (SGO)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cocklebur Creek Company, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (EDC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cocklebur Creek Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2284409.), filed by Southern Marsh Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Davis, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Marsh Collection, LLC v. Cocklebur Creek Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Marsh Collection, LLC
Represented By: Alan R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cocklebur Creek Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?