Pooler v. Livingston Parish Detention Center
Plaintiff: Terry Pooler
Defendant: Livingston Parish Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv00269
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. No service shall be made by the United States Marshals Service at this time. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.31 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to the Inmate Accounts Manager for the Livingston Parish Detention Center. Denying as moot #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/26/2021. (EDC)
May 21, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Terry Pooler. (KMW) Forms Sent to Filer on 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(KMW)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Filing Fee due by 6/1/2021. Statement of Account due by 6/1/2021. (ELW)
May 10, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ., ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terry Pooler. (EDC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Livingston Parish Detention Center, filed by Terry Pooler. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pooler v. Livingston Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Pooler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livingston Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?