Carver v. Capital Area Transit System
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Carver
Defendant: Capital Area Transit System
Case Number: 3:2021cv00281
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy L. Carver. Capital Area Transit System served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Bell, Paul)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Attorney Seth M. Dornier is enrolled as counsel for Defendant Capital Area Transit System. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/16/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Enroll Seth M. Dornier as Attorney by Capital Area Transit System. (Dornier, Seth)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Enroll Seth M. Dornier as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Capital Area Transit System. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Submitted as to Capital Area Transit System (Bell, Paul)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Bill Deville. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (EDC)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for FLSA, Breach of Contract and Wage Payment Act against Capital Area Transit System filed by Timothy L. Carver ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2287552.), filed by Timothy L. Carver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Bell, Paul) Modified on 5/17/2021 to edit text. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carver v. Capital Area Transit System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Area Transit System
Represented By: Seth M. Dornier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Carver
Represented By: Paul F. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?