Sauls et al v. Coastal Bridge Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Sauls and Luis Nieves-Rivera
Defendant: Coastal Bridge Company, LLC, Kelly Sills, Mike Giambrone and Coastal Investment Holdings, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00302
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hicks, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 9/9/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at 225-389-3602. Status Report due by 8/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/16/2021. (SGO)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants Coastal Bridge Company, LLC, Coastal Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Mike Giambrone, and Kelly Sills are granted an extension of time until 7/20/2021 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/1/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Coastal Bridge Company, LLC, Coastal Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Mike Giambrone, Kelly Sills. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Hicks, Michael)
June 30, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Sauls. Mike Giambrone served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Miller, Gregory)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Sauls. Kelly Sills served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Miller, Gregory)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Sauls. Coastal Bridge Company, LLC served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Miller, Gregory)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Coastal Bridge Company, LLC, Coastal Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Mike Giambrone, Kelly Sills. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Submitted as to Mike Giambrone (Miller, Gregory)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Submitted as to Kelly Sills (Miller, Gregory)
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Submitted as to Coastal Investment Holdings, L.L.C. (Miller, Gregory)
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Submitted as to Coastal Bridge Company, L.L.C. (Miller, Gregory)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2290571.), filed by Joe Sauls. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sauls et al v. Coastal Bridge Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Bridge Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Represented By: Brad M Barback
Represented By: Stephen Paul Beiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Sills
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Represented By: Brad M Barback
Represented By: Stephen Paul Beiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Giambrone
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Represented By: Brad M Barback
Represented By: Stephen Paul Beiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Investment Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Represented By: Brad M Barback
Represented By: Stephen Paul Beiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Sauls
Represented By: Gregory J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Nieves-Rivera
Represented By: Gregory J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?