Bell et al v. Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Richardson, David Whitehurst, Darleen Taylor, Darlene Billings, Johnital Bell, Terri Gilbert, Sandy Martinez, Cynthia Forde, Mary Jones, Glynda Bonvillain, Bonnie Haydel, Ronald Spradley, Marie Chauvin, Cheryl Huffman, Alma Watson, Elizabeth Gauthier, April Favaron, James Bell and Sharon Scott
Defendant: Larry Locicero, Dow Chemical Company, Michael Albano, Theo Webre, Donald Lyle, Kim Feltner, Eric Robertson, Eduardo Do Val, Kevin McGovern, Lance Parker, Dan Bucholtz, Ronald Lambotte, Karen Williams, Jennifer Smith, Robert Samson, Sandy Holden, Dan Jason and INEOS Americas, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00326
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #40 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand on or Before August 3, 2021 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Excess of 10 Pages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
July 29, 2021 Filing 40 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Excess of 10 Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Thornton, Jennifer) Modified on 7/30/2021 to edit the text (SWE).
July 20, 2021 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Remand filed by INEOS Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-Declaration of E Robertson, #2 Exhibit A2-Declaration of K McGovern, #3 Exhibit A3-Declaration of L Locicero, #4 Exhibit A4-Declaration of R Lambotte, #5 Exhibit B1-Bureau Lawsuit, #6 Exhibit B2-Cambre Lawsuit, #7 Exhibit B3-Comeaux Lawsuit, #8 Exhibit B4-Ellis Lawsuit)(Easterly, Tom)
July 20, 2021 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Trapolin, Edward)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The consent #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead is GRANTED, and the following Defendants now have until August 30, 2021, to file responsive pleadings: Eric Robertson, Kevin McGovern, Larry Locicero and Roland Lambotte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 7/1/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Defendant Robert Samson's #35 Motion to Substitute is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court will substitute the corrected Answer (R. Doc. 35-2) in place of Defendant's original Answer (R. Doc. 29). Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 7/1/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
July 1, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #35 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute R. Doc. 29 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 1, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 30, 2021 Filing 35 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute R. Doc. 29 by Robert Samson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Robert Samson's Answer to Petition for Damages and Request for Trial by Jury)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by Ronald Lambotte, Larry Locicero, Kevin McGovern, Eric Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Easterly, Tom) Modified on 7/1/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 30, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by INEOS Americas, LLC.(Easterly, Tom)
June 30, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Theo Webre.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Karen Williams.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jennifer Smith.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert Samson.(Trapolin, Edward) (Main Document 29 replaced on 7/2/2021 in accordance with record document 36) (NLT).
June 30, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lance Parker.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Donald Lyle.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dan Jason.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sandy Holden.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kim Feltner.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dow Chemical Company.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eduardo Do Val.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dan Bucholtz.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Albano.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Thornton, Jennifer)
June 29, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #19 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Kristen Fournier to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/21/2021. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Kristen Fournier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2302989) by Michael Albano, Dan Bucholtz, Eduardo Do Val, Dow Chemical Company, Kim Feltner, Sandy Holden, Dan Jason, Donald Lyle, Lance Parker, Robert Samson, Jennifer Smith, Theo Webre, Karen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Certificate of Good Standing NY)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INEOS Americas, LLC. (Easterly, Tom)
June 17, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Kristen Fournier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2302989). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #5 Notice of Related Proceedings filed by Dow Chemical Company. (Trapolin, Edward) Modified on 6/21/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motions for Alvin Lee and John Ewald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/15/2021. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc. for Dow Chemical Company.. (Trapolin, Edward)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for John Ewald to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2301262) by Michael Albano, Dan Bucholtz, Eduardo Do Val, Dow Chemical Company, Kim Feltner, Sandy Holden, Dan Jason, Donald Lyle, Lance Parker, Robert Samson, Jennifer Smith, Theo Webre, Karen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Alvin Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2301255) by Michael Albano, Dan Bucholtz, Eduardo Do Val, Dow Chemical Company, Kim Feltner, Sandy Holden, Dan Jason, Donald Lyle, Lance Parker, Robert Samson, Jennifer Smith, Theo Webre, Karen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Alvin Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2301255), #12 MOTION for John Ewald to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2301262). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants INEOS Americas, LLC, Eric Robertson, Kevin McGovern, Larry Locicero, and Roland Lambotte have until June 30, 2021, to file responsive pleadings or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/14/2021. (EDC)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant's #3 Motion to Substitute is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court will substitute the corrected Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 3-2) in place of the original Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Because the requirements of Local Rule 7(a) are met, Defendants' ex parte #2 Motion for Extension is GRANTED, and Defendants now have until June 30, 2021, to file responsive pleadings or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Related Case with Corrected Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/10/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Related Case with Corrected Notice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Thornton, Jennifer)
June 10, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Related Case with Corrected Notice. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Johnital Bell (Thornton, Jennifer) Modified on 6/11/2021 to replace document as per Order #7 (LLH).
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by INEOS Americas, LLC, Ronald Lambotte, Larry Locicero, Kevin McGovern, Eric Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Easterly, Tom)
June 8, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Pleading with Corrected Caption. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 8, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Pleading with Corrected Caption by Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal)(Trapolin, Edward) Modified on 6/8/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE).
June 7, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
June 6, 2021 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael Albano, Dan Bucholtz, Eduardo Do Val, Dow Chemical Company, Kim Feltner, Sandy Holden, Dan Jason, Donald Lyle, Lance Parker, Robert Samson, Jennifer Smith, Theo Webre, Karen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC Iberville, Case Number 80713. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2295291), filed by Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal INEOS Americas, LLC, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Record Pt 1, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Record Pt 2, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trapolin, Edward) Modified on 6/14/2021 to sub document as per Order #8 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Richardson
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whitehurst
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darleen Taylor
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Billings
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnital Bell
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Gilbert
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Martinez
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Forde
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jones
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynda Bonvillain
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Haydel
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Spradley
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Chauvin
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Huffman
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Watson
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Gauthier
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Favaron
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bell
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Scott
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Locicero
Represented By: Tom Samuel Easterly
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Leah Canaday Cook
Represented By: Robin P. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Albano
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theo Webre
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Lyle
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Feltner
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Robertson
Represented By: Tom Samuel Easterly
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Leah Canaday Cook
Represented By: Robin P. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Do Val
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McGovern
Represented By: Tom Samuel Easterly
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Leah Canaday Cook
Represented By: Robin P. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Parker
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Bucholtz
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lambotte
Represented By: Tom Samuel Easterly
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Leah Canaday Cook
Represented By: Robin P. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Williams
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Smith
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald,
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Samson
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald,
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Holden
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Jason
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INEOS Americas, LLC
Represented By: Tom Samuel Easterly
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Leah Canaday Cook
Represented By: Robin P. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?