LeBoeuf v. Hooper
Petitioner: Brandon LeBoeuf
Respondent: Attorney General Jeff Landry and Timothy Hooper
Case Number: 3:2021cv00329
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Return on FedEx Confirmation as to #2 Habeas Corpus Order (SWE)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: In order for this Court to determine the action, if any, that shall be taken on this application,the District Attorney for the Parish of EBR shall file an answer & memo of authorities, along w/copies of all briefs & memoranda. Along with the response, The District Attorney for the 19th Judicial District Court shall file an electronic certified copy of the state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts as well as a certified electronic copy of all documents. The Clerk of Court for the 19th Judicial District Court shall file, in a conventional manner, not electronic, a courtesy copy of the entire state court record filed by the state. The Clerk of this Court serve, by any means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of the entire application & this order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney for the Parish of EBR, and the Clerk of Court for 19th Judicial District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Shipment Confirmations)(SWE)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ALAMDC-2296234.), filed by Brandon LeBoeuf. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit List Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-F, #4 Exhibit Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit Exhibits H-U, #6 Exhibit Exhibit V, Part I, #7 Exhibit Exhibit V, Part II, #8 Exhibit Exhibit V, Part III, #9 Exhibit Exhibit V, Part IV, #10 Exhibit Exhibits W-KK, #11 Exhibit Exhibits LL-NN)(Collins, Sean) Modified on 6/4/2021 to replace main document, exhibits 6,7, and 9 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBoeuf v. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon LeBoeuf
Represented By: Sean Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?