Williams v. Kemper Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Tamica L. Williams
Defendant: Kemper Insurance Company doing business as United Insurance Company of America, Prudential Insurance Company doing business as ABC Insurance Company and Bobbie Reddin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00360
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Considering the #9 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay, the motion is granted. This matter is stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/16/2021. (DCB)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Substitute #9 Opposed Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay . Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/15/2021. (LLH)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Opposed Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay by Kemper Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Jodon, Gerald)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay by Kemper Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Jodon, Gerald) Modified on 6/30/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE). Modified on 7/15/2021 to replace documents as per Order #12(LLH).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 and #4 Motions for Mark Jodon and Luke C. MacDowall to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT regarding #4 MOTION for Luke C. MacDowall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2305480) by Kemper Insurance Company. (Griffitts, Ryan)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT regarding #3 MOTION for Mark Jodon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2305478) by Kemper Insurance Company. (Griffitts, Ryan)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/24/2021. (BLR)
June 24, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Mark Jodon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2305478), #4 MOTION for Luke C. MacDowall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2305480). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Luke C. MacDowall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2305480) by Kemper Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Griffitts, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Mark Jodon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2305478) by Kemper Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Griffitts, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Kemper Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Griffitts, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd DC, Case Number 00129718B. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2305009), filed by Kemper Insurance Company doing business as United Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Griffitts, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Kemper Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Insurance Company doing business as United Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Ryan Griffitts
Represented By: Gerald Mark Jodon
Represented By: Luke C. MacDowall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company doing business as ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Reddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamica L. Williams
Represented By: Maynard Keith Batiste, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?