Smith v. East Feliciana Parish
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Smith
Defendant: East Feliciana Parish
Case Number: 3:2021cv00361
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Commentary Article by Michael Dewayne Smith. (EDC)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Michael Smith to Middle District of Louisiana Clerk of Court Re: False Charges. (EDC)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Michael Smith to Middle District of Louisiana Clerk of Court Re: False Imprisonment. (EDC)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Letter dated June 25, 2021 from Michael Smith to Middle District of Louisiana Clerk of Court Re: Statement /Brief of Harassment. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope) (EDC)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Go Forward with the Ruling by Michael Dewayne. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(EDC)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of letter from Louisiana Department of Health to Judicial District Court of E. Feliciana Parish re Notification of Limitations of patient communication by Michael Dewayne Smith. (EDC)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from Michael Smith to Middle District of Louisiana Clerk of Court Re: Falsely Accused of Mistaken Identity. (EDC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Letter dated 6/16/2021 from Michael Dewayne Smith to Clerk of Court Re: Status of Case (KMW)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against East Feliciana Parish, filed by Michael Dewayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(KMW)
June 21, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. East Feliciana Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Feliciana Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?