Williams v. 18th JDC of Iberville Parish et al
Plaintiff: Columbus Chris Williams
Defendant: 18th JDC of Iberville Parish and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv00364
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Letter dated August 5, 2021 from Columbus Chris Williams to Federal Middle District Court Re: Qualified Immunity. (EDC)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (DCB)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/26/2021. (DCB)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 RULING: This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the Court's filing fee. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/26/2021. (DCB)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff has not applied to proceed in forma pauperis in this case, however, should such an application be submitted, it would be denied. Plaintiff has, on three or more prior occasions while incarcerated, brought actions or appeals in a federal district court that have been dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim. IT IS ORDERED that by no later than July 20, 2021, Plaintiff shall pay $402.00, the full amount of the Court's filing fee. The filing fee must be paid in full in a single payment. No partial payments will be accepted. Failure to pay the Court's filing fee within the time provided may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/29/2021. (BLR)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 18th JDC of Iberville Parish, John Doe, filed by Columbus Chris Williams.(KMW)
June 22, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. 18th JDC of Iberville Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18th JDC of Iberville Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbus Chris Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?