Jones v. Gooden et al
Plaintiff: Willie Jones
Defendant: Charles Gooden and Tim Hooper
Case Number: 3:2021cv00372
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (DCB)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tim Hooper. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Order)(Thompson, Kendale)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Charles Gooden. (US Marshal, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tim Hooper served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (US Marshal, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charles Gooden, Tim Hooper. (NOTICE: Summons submitted to the USM for service) (KMW)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER:USM is to serve the defendants wherever found. Within 90 days of the defendants' first appearance, the parties shall complete all discovery. Counsel for defendants shall provide to the plaintiff all medical records, etc. pertinent to the issues in this case, within 20 days of the defendants' first appearance. Discovery shall proceed as stated herein. Within 120 days of the defendant's first appearance, the parties shall file cross motions for summary judgment.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/29/2021. (KMW)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.00 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 06/29/2021. (NLT)
June 28, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Willie Jones. (KMW)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Gooden, Tim Hooper, filed by Willie Jones.(KMW)
June 25, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Gooden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Gooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hooper
Represented By: Kendale Javaris Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?