Walton v. Riverbend Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Jerome D. Walton
Defendant: Pat Stock, Tegr Tollier, Unknown Paul, Bandon Wright, Shane Tullier, Pat Cazes, Paul Pattan, Unknown Dwight, West Baton Rouge Work Release, Lester Pickney, Riverbend Detention Center and Unknown Tegr
Case Number: 3:2021cv00377
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00389. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND REASONS that the captioned matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 6/29/2021.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
June 30, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
June 30, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The telephone conference scheduled in this matter for June 17, 2021, could not be held because plaintiff failed to participate. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the conference is hereby RESCHEDULED for Tuesday, June 29, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. Plaintiff shall participate in the conference via telephone with the Court initiating the call. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Warden of Richland Parish Detention Center have Jerome D. Walton, #547176, made available by telephone for the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff file a written change of address with this Court within ten days if he is transferred or released from the Richland Parish Detention Center. If plaintiff fails to keep the Court apprised of his current address in the future, his claims may be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 6/24/21.(cg)(cc: Warden via Facsimile and US Mail) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Plaintiff filed the instant civil action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983; however, the Court cannot discern from the complaint why he filed his lawsuit in the Eastern District of Louisiana. Accordingly, a telephone conference is hereby SCHEDULED in this matter for Thursday, June 17, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff telephone the undersigned's chambers at 504-589-7575 on Thursday, June 17, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., to participate in the conference. If plaintiff is currently incarcerated, and if his custodian requires an order directing that plaintiff be made available to participate in this conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 5/21/21.(cg)(cc: Jerome D. Walton both address) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 Response by Jerome D. Walton to #8 Notice of Deficient Filing (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 Supplement to #6 Complaint by Jerome D. Walton. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
May 4, 2021 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt numbers LAE067392 and LAE067393) (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/7/2021. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerome D. Walton. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Filing)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jerome D. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Original deficient complaint)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/14/2021. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerome D. Walton. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 **DEFICIENT**COMPLAINT against Lt. Dwight, Paul, Riverbend Detention Center, Sgt. Tegr, Officer Paul, Tegr Tollier, Lester Pinkney filed by Jerome D. Walton.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 3/18/2021. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT**COMPLAINT against Lt. Dwight, Paul, Riverbend Detention Center, Sgt. Tegr filed by Jerome D. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Riverbend Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tegr Tollier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandon Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Tullier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Cazes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pattan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dwight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Baton Rouge Work Release
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Pickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverbend Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tegr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome D. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?