Joseph v. Warden
Petitioner: Ranell Joseph
Respondent: Jeff Landry and Warden
Case Number: 3:2021cv00381
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Letter dated 07/07/2021 from Ranell Joseph to Clerk of Court Re: Case Transfer (NLT)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01273. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 2, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
July 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Case transferred to District of Louisiana Middle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 7/1/21.(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Ranell Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits)(ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ajn). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ranell Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?