Family Values Resource Institute, Inc. v. State of Louisiana, Department of Children and Family Services et al
Plaintiff: Family Values Resource Institute, Inc.
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Children and Family Services, State of Louisiana, Division of Administration, Office of State Procurement and State Of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2021cv00415
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 9/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/10/2021. (SWE)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/20/2021 to File Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by the Division of Administration, Office of State Procurement and #6 RULE 12(B), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Department of Children and Family Services. Any replies shall be filed by 10/4/2021. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 09/02/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 RULE 12(B), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Department of Children and Family Services, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jursidiction by the Division of Administration, Office of State Procurement Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Tyler, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jursidiction by the Division of Administration, Office of State Procurement, #6 RULE 12(B), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Department of Children and Family Services : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jursidiction by the Division of Administration, Office of State Procurement by State Of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Dunaway, Rachel)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 12(B), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Department of Children and Family Services by State Of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Contract, #3 Exhibit B - Contract Amendment, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Dunaway, Rachel) Modified on 8/13/2021 (LLH). Modified on 8/13/2021 to replace exhibits A and B (LLH).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Document. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 4, pages 3 - 7, in place of R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/29/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Document . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Document by State Of Louisiana, State Of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Dunaway, Rachel)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendants State Of Louisiana are granted an extension of time until 8/13/2021 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/26/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by State of Louisiana, Department of Children and Family Services, State of Louisiana, Division of Administration, Office of State Procurement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunaway, Rachel) Modified on 7/26/2021 to edit event type (SGO).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge John W. deGravelles. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-708443. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2320537), filed by State of Louisiana, Division of Administration, Office of State Procurement, State of Louisiana, Department of Children and Family Services. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record)(Dunaway, Rachel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/21/2021) (ELW). Modified on 7/21/2021 to flatten document (ELW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/30/2021 in accordance with record document 5) (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Values Resource Institute, Inc. v. State of Louisiana, Department of Children and Family Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Values Resource Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Michael LaShaun Tyler
Represented By: Mesa Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Children and Family Services
Represented By: Rachel Phaedra Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Division of Administration, Office of State Procurement
Represented By: Rachel Phaedra Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Louisiana
Represented By: Rachel Phaedra Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?