Snearl et al v. City of Port Allen et al
Plaintiff: Tara Snearl and Ayanna Tran
Defendant: City of Port Allen, Mike Cazes, ABC Insurance Agencies, Tiffeny Robertson Wycoskie, Port Allen Police Department, Briant Landry and West Baton Rouge Sheriff Office
Case Number: 3:2021cv00455
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Due to the still incomplete briefing on the pending dispositive motions (R. Docs. 14, 15 and 16), the telephone scheduling conference set for 10/14/2021 is rescheduled for 12/16/2021, at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall file an amended status report on or before 12/2/2021. The amended status report shall contain proposed deadlines to complete discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/4/2021. (SWE)
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by Tara Snearl, Ayanna Tran. (Pedrami, Erin)
September 27, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Strike MOTION for a More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Strike by Briant Landry, Port Allen Police Department, Tiffeny Robertson Wycoskie. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Thomas, John). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement and MOTION to Strike on 9/24/2021 (EDC).
September 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Port Allen Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 ORDER)(Thomas, John)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or Alternatively MOTION for More Definite Statement by Mike Cazes, West Baton Rouge Sheriff Office. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wixom, Jason) Modified on 8/27/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 9/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/26/2021. (SWE)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The filed portions of the state court record demonstrate that the plaintiff was represented by attorney William Most and then later represented by attorney Erin Pedrami. (R. Doc. 1-2). Attorney Most has informed the Court that prior to removal, he withdrew as counsel and plaintiff is represented by Attorney Pedrami. (R. Doc. 11). Accordingly, the clerk of court shall terminate Attorney Most as counsel in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SWE)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Status of Counsel by Tara Snearl, Ayanna Tran (Most, William)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings filed by Mike Cazes, Mike Cazes answer due 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/23/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SWE)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings by Mike Cazes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wixom, Jason)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Jason Paul Wixom for Mike Cazes.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
August 19, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Enroll Blake J. Arcuri and Jason P. Wixom as Attorney by Mike Cazes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Enroll Counsel of Record)(Arcuri, Blake)
August 17, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Enroll Blake J. Arcuri and Jason P. Wixom as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The defendant has until 9/7/2021 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/16/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal (Corrected) filed by City of Port Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/16/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by City of Port Allen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; ORDER)(Thomas, John)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal (Corrected) by City of Port Allen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit 1)(Thomas, John)
August 13, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal (Corrected), #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney William Brock Most regarding Erin L. Pedrami who is Co-Counsel for party Tara Snearl and Ayanna Tran. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial District Court, State of Louisiana for the Parish of West Baton Rouge, Case Number 1044783. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2328559), filed by City of Port Allen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Thomas, John) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/16/2021 in accordance with RD 5) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snearl et al v. City of Port Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Snearl
Represented By: Erin Lee Pedrami
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayanna Tran
Represented By: Erin Lee Pedrami
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Port Allen
Represented By: John Scott Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Cazes
Represented By: Blake J Arcuri
Represented By: Jason Paul Wixom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Agencies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffeny Robertson Wycoskie
Represented By: John Scott Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Allen Police Department
Represented By: John Scott Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briant Landry
Represented By: John Scott Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Baton Rouge Sheriff Office
Represented By: Jason Paul Wixom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?