Thomas v. State of Louisiana, et al.
Plaintiff: Dr. Erica Thomas and Erica Thomas
Defendant: The State of Louisiana, Through the Louisiana State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education, Louisiana Special School District and Ernest Garrett Individually And In His Official Capacity as Super, State Of Louisiana and Ernest Garrett
Case Number: 3:2021cv00458
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Ernest Garrett, State Of Louisiana.(Keenan, Christine)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL, AMENDING AND RESTATED COMPLAINT against Ernest Garrett, State Of Louisiana, filed by Erica Thomas.(LLH)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Dr. Erica Thomas to correct the name of the State entity defendant due to a recent change in the law. The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket the [4-2] Supplemental, Amending and Restated Complaint, which shall become Plaintiff's operative complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 08/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by Erica Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint)(Craft, Jill)
August 23, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2021 at 04:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Ernest Garrett, State Of Louisiana.(Keenan, Christine)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-709272. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2328712), filed by State of Louisiana and Ernest Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Attachment)(Keenan, Christine) Modified to edit text on 8/10/2021 (BLR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. State of Louisiana, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Erica Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Thomas
Represented By: Jill L Craft
Represented By: Kaitlin Aubrey Wall
Represented By: William Brett Conrad, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Louisiana, Through the Louisiana State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education, Louisiana Special School District and Ernest Garrett Individually And In His Official Capacity as Super
Represented By: Christine S. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Louisiana
Represented By: Christine S. Keenan
Represented By: Sarah Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Garrett
Represented By: Christine S. Keenan
Represented By: Sarah Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?