Glascock v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jason Glascock
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00501
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Return on Electronic Transfer from Southern District of Indiana. (EDC)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Southern Indiana. (ELW)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ELW)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ELW)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Glascock. Cook Group Incorporated served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021; Cook Incorporated served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021; Cook Medical Incorporated served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021; Cook Medical, LLC served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Joy, Joseph)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/8/2021. (BLR)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2336191.), filed by Jason Glascock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-CI, #3 Summons-CMI, #4 Summons-CGI, #5 Summons-CMLLC)(Joy, Joseph) (Attachment 2 -5 replaced on 8/27/2021 to flatten documents) (ELW). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/27/2021 to flatten the document) (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glascock v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Glascock
Represented By: Joseph R. Joy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?