ACT, Inc. v. Ring Publications, LLC et al
Defendant: ACT, Inc., Ring Publications, LLC d/b/a Mastery Prep, Craig Gehring, Ring Publications, LLC doing business as MasteryPrep and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2021cv00520
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ACT, Inc.. Craig Gehring waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Ring Publications, LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Chapman, Laura)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 11/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 9/21/2021. (KAH)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Craig Gehring. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ring Publications, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) Modified on 9/17/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACT, Inc. (O'Brien, Juston)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 and #5 Motions for Laura L. Chapman and Yasamin Parsafar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 9/14/2021. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Submitted as to Ring Publications d/b/a MasteryPrep (O'Brien, Juston)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Submitted as to Craig Gehring (O'Brien, Juston)
September 13, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Yasamin Parsafar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2339652), #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Laura L. Chapman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2339645). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Yasamin Parsafar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2339652) by ACT, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Order)(O'Brien, Juston)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Laura L. Chapman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2339645) by ACT, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(O'Brien, Juston)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of AO 121 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (NLT)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of AO 120 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (NLT) Modified on 9/10/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craig Gehring, Ring Publications, LLC d/b/a Mastery Prep ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2339105.), filed by ACT, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Juston)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACT, Inc. v. Ring Publications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACT, Inc.
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ring Publications, LLC d/b/a Mastery Prep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Gehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ring Publications, LLC doing business as MasteryPrep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?