Spurlock et al v. Mony Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Lakisha Spurlock and Babington Anyaele
Defendant: Mony Life Insurance Company of America, Diversified Healthcare Investments, L.L.C. and Diversified Healthcare Developments, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00521
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (NLT)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss, with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/13/2021. (DCB)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Pellegrin, David)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 11/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 9/21/2021. (KAH)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Diversified Healthcare Developments, L.L.C, Mony Life Insurance Company of America. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) Modified on 9/13/2021 (NLT).
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diversified Healthcare Developments, L.L.C., Mony Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2339678.), filed by Lakisha Spurlock, Babington Anyaele. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Proposed Summons, #3 Attachment Proposed Summons)(Pellegrin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurlock et al v. Mony Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakisha Spurlock
Represented By: David Craig Pellegrin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babington Anyaele
Represented By: David Craig Pellegrin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mony Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Healthcare Investments, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Healthcare Developments, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?