Braud v. The Union Central Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Maria Braud
Defendant: The Union Central Life Insurance Company and Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00546
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 11/18/2021 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2021. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 10/28/2021. Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 5/25/2022. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 6/24/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/26/2022. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/26/2022. Discovery from Experts due by 10/26/2022. Motions shall be filed by 11/23/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/15/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2023 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 5/22/2023. Bench Trial set for 6/5/2023 to 6/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/10/2021. (SWE)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Reference: The foregoing matter is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for the conduct of all further proceedings and the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and the foregoing consent of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/09/2021. (NLT)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Consent MOTION to Dismiss UCLIC Without Prejudice and Change the Caption of this Civil Action. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/08/2021. (NLT)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Dismiss UCLIC Without Prejudice and Change the Caption of this Civil Action by Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Wilty, Reagan) Modified on 11/5/2021 to edit text. (EDC). Added MOTION to Change The Caption on 11/8/2021 (NLT).
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT to Proceed before US Magistrate by Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation, Maria Braud. (NLT)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Consent Form)(Sartin, Barry) Modified on 11/5/2021 to edit the text and remove the consent to be filed as a separate entry (NLT).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the chambers of the undersigned at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 11/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/30/2021. (SWE)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation.(Wilty, Reagan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 710739. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2342891), filed by Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Filing State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal, #6 Affidavit 1447 Listing, #7 Attachment State Court Record, #8 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilty, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braud v. The Union Central Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Braud
Represented By: Preston L Hayes
Represented By: Barry W Sartin, Jr
Represented By: David W. Ardoin
Represented By: Ryan P Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Union Central Life Insurance Company
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Represented By: Reagan Reynolds Wilty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Represented By: Reagan Reynolds Wilty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?