Varnado v. Capital One, N.A.
Plaintiff: mrs marguerite varnado and Marguerite Varnado
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00588
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1971
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant, Capital One, N.A. filed #4 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time seeking a 21-day extension to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Considering the requirements of Local Rule 7(a) have been met, Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Capital One, N.A. to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is December 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/8/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 7, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Horn, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/7/2021 to edit text (SWE).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 12/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/21/2021. (KAH)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital One, N.A.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2352923.), filed by marguerite varnado. (Attachments: #1 Attachment subpoena for production of transaction video, #2 Attachment consent for magistrate judge, #3 Attachment civil cover sheet, #4 Attachment summons, #5 Attachment appearance of counsel)(Lipscomb, Rosalind)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varnado v. Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: mrs marguerite varnado
Represented By: Rosalind D. Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Varnado
Represented By: Rosalind D. Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Brent C. Wyatt
Represented By: Elizabeth Swingle Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?