City of Baton Rouge, Parish of East Baton Rouge v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: City of Baton Rouge, Parish of East Baton Rouge
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00627
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Northern District of California. (LLH)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order)(LLH)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 Minute Order NEF) (LLH)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/8/2021. (KAH)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney J. Burton LeBlanc, IV regarding Russell W. Budd, Christine C. Mansour, James C. Peterson, Marl P. Pifko, Michael J. Fuller Jr., Paul T. Fuller Jr., Peter J. Mougey and Anthony J. Majestro who are Co-Counsel for party City of Baton Rouge, Parish of East Baton Rouge. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2359077.), filed by City of Baton Rouge, Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(LeBlanc, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Baton Rouge, Parish of East Baton Rouge v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Baton Rouge, Parish of East Baton Rouge
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Anderson O. Dotson, III
Represented By: Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By: Edward James
Represented By: Michael L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?