Environmental, Safety & Health Consulting Services, Inc. v. Willow Glen Ventures, LLC
Plaintiff: Environmental, Safety & Health Consulting Services, Inc.
Defendant: Willow Glen Ventures, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Asset Lifecycle Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00668
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Willow Glen Ventures, LLC by Asset Lifecycle Management, LLC. (Pappas, Gus)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Willow Glen Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Trew, Tyler)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Third Party Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Willow Glen Ventures, LLC by Asset Lifecycle Management, LLC.(Pappas, Gus)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Gus E. Pappas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/22/2021. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Gus E. Pappas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2377034) by Asset Lifecycle Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit GEP Sworn Statement, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brooks, Michelle)
December 21, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Gus E. Pappas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2377034). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
December 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willow Glen Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Corales, Sheri)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willow Glen Ventures, LLC. Asset Lifecycle Management, LLC served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Corales, Sheri)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 1/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/30/2021. (KAH)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Asset Lifecycle Management, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Asset Lifecycle Management, LLC, filed by Willow Glen Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons)(Trew, Tyler)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Willow Glen Ventures, LLC.(Trew, Tyler)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney James T. Rogers, III regarding Jeffrey M. Suprenant who is Co-Counsel for party Environmental, Safety &Health Consulting Services, Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial District Court of the Parish of Iberville, State of Louisiana, Case Number 81120. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2365053), filed by Willow Glen Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trew, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Environmental, Safety & Health Consulting Services, Inc. v. Willow Glen Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental, Safety & Health Consulting Services, Inc.
Represented By: James T. Rogers, III
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Robert Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Glen Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Sheri Lynn Corales
Represented By: Tyler Davis Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Asset Lifecycle Management, LLC
Represented By: Michelle DeLoach Brooks
Represented By: Gus E. Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?