Ardeshna et al v. Blinken et al
Plaintiff: Pratik Ardeshna and Dipti Ardeshna
Defendant: Antony Blinken, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 3:2022cv00005
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
January 24, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Submitted as to (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons for Blinken)(Scott, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/24/2022) (ELW). Modified on 1/24/2022 to flatten document (ELW).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 3/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/7/2022. (KAH)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for The Executive Office Office of the Legal Adviser. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (ELW)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. US Atty of Middle District, Ronald Gathe, Jr. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2380675.), filed by Pratik Ardeshna, Dipti Ardeshna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Attachment Summons for Blinken, #7 Attachment Summons for Mayorkas, #8 Attachment Summons for Jaddou, #9 Attachment Summons for Garland, #10 Attachment Summons for Gathe)(Scott, Paul) (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/6/2022) (Attachment 6 - 10 replaced on 1/6/2022) (ELW). Modified on 1/6/2022 to correct page orientation and flatten summons(ELW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ardeshna et al v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pratik Ardeshna
Represented By: Paul H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dipti Ardeshna
Represented By: Paul H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?