Slaughter v. Magnum Piering, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott H Slaughter
Defendant: Magnum Piering, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00045
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 4/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/1/2022. (KAH)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott H Slaughter. Magnum Piering, Inc. served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (Stevens, Gregory)
January 23, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MAGNUM PIERING, INC.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against MAGNUM PIERING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2387190.), filed by SCOTT H SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons in a Civil Action)(Stevens, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. Magnum Piering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott H Slaughter
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Represented By: Warner Joseph Delaune, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnum Piering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?